Jolly, Rajnee Kumari (CPSO#: 73905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: Singh, Rajnee Kumari (used until: 12 Dec 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsridge Medical Centre
Unit 2
2015 Kingsridge Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 4Y7
Phone: (905) 827-3006
Fax: (905) 825-9431
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjit S. Jolly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jolly ( CPSO# 73905 )
Dr. S. Jolly ( CPSO# 73940 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Room C3-118
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 524-2712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJNEE KUMARI JOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOLLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001