Jolly, Umjeet Singh (CPSO#: 88481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener, Ontario
Waterloo ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6578 Ext. 1500
Fax: (519) 749-6589
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

NeuroCardiac Associates
302-564 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener, Ontario
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-0495
Fax: (519) 571-7555
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.M. Cartagena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Jolly ( CPSO# 88481 )
Dr. A. Cartagena ( CPSO# 88477 )

Business Address:
Neurocardiac Associates
302 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 742-0495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UMJEET SINGH JOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOLLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012