Joly, Jacqueline Lorraine (CPSO#: 61671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Joly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Patient support at 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 26 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE LORRAINE JOLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 1989 to 18 Oct 1989
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1989