Jomphe, Michele (CPSO#: 94285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex
General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-5295
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Canada
Phone: (705) 337-4045
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

1405 Edward St
BOX 8000
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Canada
Phone: (705) 3722944
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Middlesex Hosptial Alliance
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Societe Professionnelle De Medecine Michele Jomphe

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jomphe ( CPSO# 94285 )

Business Address:
Notre Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 372-3350

Business Address:
Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone Number: (705) 337-4045

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex Alliance Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE JOMPHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOMPHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010