Joneja, Anu (CPSO#: 76357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto - Mississauga
Health and Counselling Centre
William G. Davis Builiding
Room 1123A- 3359 Mississauga Road
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Phone: 905-828-5255
Fax: 905-828-3852
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANU JONEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONEJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003