Jones, Andrea Kimberley (CPSO#: 70435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian bay General Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300 Ext. 3442
Fax: (705) 526-3448
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

309 Midland Ave
Midland ON  L4R3K5
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

371 Yonge St, Unit 2
Midland ON  L4R 3A7
Canada
Phone: (705) 245-3330
Fax: (705) 526-8364
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scanlan and Jones Medicine Professional Corporation / Scanlan et Jones Medecine Societe Professionelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Scanlan ( CPSO# 70118 )
Dr. A. Jones ( CPSO# 70435 )

Business Address:
309 Midland Avenue
Midland ON  L4R 3K5
Phone Number: (705) 527-7744

Business Address:
371 Yonge Street
Midland ON  L4R 3A7
Phone Number: (705) 245-3330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA KIMBERLEY JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1998