Jones, Angela Mary (CPSO#: 73586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterdown Family Medicine Clinic
95 Hamilton Street North
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Phone: (905) 689-6134
Fax: (905) 689-5665
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jones ( CPSO# 73586 )

Business Address:
Waterdown Family Medicine Clinic
95 Hamilton Street North
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-6134

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
Alexander Place
329 Parkside Drive
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-2662

Business Address:
Cama Woodlands
159 Panin Road
Burlington ON  L7P 5A6
Phone Number: (905) 681-6441

Business Address:
Carpenter Hospice
2250 Parkway Drive
Burlington ON  L7P 1T1
Phone Number: (905) 631-9994

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MARY JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001