Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Jones, Ann Deborah (CPSO#: 58161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: Hinsberger, Ann Deborah (used until: 28 Feb 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre for M H C
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ann Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jones ( CPSO# 58161 )

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for M H C
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANN DEBORAH JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988