Jones, Beverly Ann (CPSO#: 84416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
73 George Street
Brantford ON  N3T 2Y3
Phone: 519-756-8228 Ext. 5803
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLY ANN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2012