Jones, Charles Samuel (CPSO#: 21147)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Howard University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 23 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995