Jones, Derek Lloyd (CPSO#: 54873)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: For patients seen at either the Toronto General Hospital or St Michael's Hospital please contact that hospital. For patients seen at the First Canadian Place Medical Centre please contact the Doctor's Office at the Royal Bank Plaza.
Instructions: For patients seen at the Workplace Safety and Insurance Board please contact the WSIB. For patients seen at the Office of the Chief Coroner of Ontario please contact the Coroner's Office.
Date Received: 27 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014