Jones, Glenn Wayne (CPSO#: 53865)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glenn Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Credit Valley Hospital Oncology Centre, 2200 Eglinton Avenue West, Mississauga, ON, L5M 2N1
Date Received: 05 Aug 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Antigua and Barbuda

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Dec 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2016