Jones, Griffith David (CPSO#: 73009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8551
Fax: (613) 737-8070
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Griffith Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jones ( CPSO# 73009 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRIFFITH DAVID JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2002 to 13 Jan 2003
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003