Jones, Kathryn Victoria (CPSO#: 62400)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2000