Jones, Kevin Charles (CPSO#: 91494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3A50
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75613
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin C Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jones ( CPSO# 91494 )

Business Address:
Suite 3A50
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN CHARLES JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2014