Jones, Kristen Susanne (CPSO#: 81329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cottage Country Family Health Team
Unit 1
5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z3
Phone: (705) 687-2271
Fax: (705) 687-7575
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: (705) 645-1225
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristen Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jones ( CPSO# 81329 )

Business Address:
Cottage Country Family Health Team
Unit 1
5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z3
Phone Number: (705) 687-2271

Business Address:
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTEN SUSANNE JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006