Jones, Nicola Lorraine (CPSO#: 61068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of GI/Nutrition, Room 8409
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7734
Fax: (416) 813-6531
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. NICOLA LORRAINE JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1990