Jones, Paul Bernard (CPSO#: 95530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Jones, Paul (used until: 07 Jul 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Emergency Medical Services
Guelph General Hospital
Suite 103
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 837-1401
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul B. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jones ( CPSO# 95530 )

Business Address:
Guelph Emergency Medical Services
Guelph General Hospital
103 - 73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL BERNARD JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013