Jones-Hiscock, Cherie Lynn (CPSO#: 71041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone: (613) 549-7644
Fax: (613) 549-7387
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Feb 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERIE LYNN JONES-HISCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES-HISCOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Apr 1997 to 27 Jun 1997
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2000