Jonker, Derek James (CPSO#: 66672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital- Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Box 911
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70168
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Irving Greenberg Family Cancer Cent
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7700
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Jonker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jonker ( CPSO# 66672 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
The Irving Greenberg Family Cancer Centre
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK JAMES JONKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1998