Joo, Gul Pil (CPSO#: 87235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Korean

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
49 Mill Street
Killaloe ON  K0J 2A0
Phone: (613) 757-0004
Fax: (613) 757-0005
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G.P. Joo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Joo ( CPSO# 87235 )

Business Address:
49 Mill Street
Killaloe ON  K0J 2A0
Phone Number: (613) 757-0004

Business Address:
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3045

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUL PIL JOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009