Joo, Hwan Suk (CPSO#: 65246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St.
Dept Of Anaesthesia
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hwan Joo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Joo ( CPSO# 65246 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HWAN SUK JOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993