Jordan, Brian Christopher (CPSO#: 22134)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416 398 0638 Fax: 416 398 5932
Date Received: 23 Sep 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012