Jordan, Edward Henry (CPSO#: 61732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Water Lane
Box 10
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Jordan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jordan ( CPSO# 61732 )

Business Address:
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone Number: (705) 567-2224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2000 to 15 Sep 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 May 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 May 2011 Active View Details [+]


            As from May 16, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Edward Henry Jordan,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Jordan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            B(6)  Clinical Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Jordan, undertake to restrict my practice in the following
                        ways:
                  
                        (i)   I will not engage in the practice of obstetrics;  
                  
                        (ii)  More specifically, but without limiting the generality of the
                              above, 
                  
                              a.    I will not engage in any pre-natal care, labour and
                                    delivery and/or post-natal care whatsoever; 
                  
                              b.    I will ensure that all patients who present as pregnant
                                    to my family practice are referred to a doctor
                                    qualified in obstetrics for pre-natal care as soon as
                                    possible and, in any event, no later than 10 weeks of
                                    gestation; 
                  
                              c.    I will ensure that any patient who presents to my
                                    family practice as pregnant past 10 weeks of gestation
                                    is referred to a doctor qualified in obstetrics for
                                    pre-natal care immediately;
                  
                              d.    if a woman presents to me while I am providing medical
                                    services in a hospital, be it in the Emergency Room or
                                    otherwise, I will make sufficient enquiries, reasonable
                                    in the circumstances, to determine whether or not she
                                    is pregnant; and
                  
                              e.    if a pregnant woman presents to me while I am providing
                                    medical services in a hospital, be it in the Emergency
                                    Room or otherwise, I will promptly ensure that I make
                                    personal contact with the patient's doctor who is
                                    qualified in obstetrics or, if said doctor is not
                                    available, another doctor qualified in obstetrics,
                                    about the care and management I propose for the
                                    pregnant patient (whether or not that care and
                                    management is related to her pregnancy) and I will
                                    abide by any directions and/or recommendations provided
                                    to me by the doctor qualified in obstetrics with whom I
                                    have consulted.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Jordan, undertake to participate and agree that the sole
                        exception to the restrictions set out in B(6)(a) above is as
                        follows: if a patient presents to be as pregnant I may take certain
                        baseline measurements (e.g. height and weight) if I believe that
                        same may assist the obstetrician to whom I am transferring the
                        patient.