Jose, Peter Francisco (CPSO#: 60832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2273 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1N 1T8
Phone: (416) 269-2121
Fax: (416) 269-4854
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter F. Jose Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jose ( CPSO# 60832 )

Business Address:
102 Craiglee Drive
Scarborough ON  M1N 2M7
Phone Number: (416) 264-2000

Business Address:
2273 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1N 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 269-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 31 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 31 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 31, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Francisco Jose,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Jose to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective October 31, 2015, Dr. Jose is prohibited from prescribing the
                  following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding
                  regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 Relinquished

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        Relinquished

            All Other Monitored Drugs
            (as defined under the Narcotic Safety and  Relinquished
            Awareness Act, S.O., 2010, c. 22)

            Dr. Jose shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his
            Office Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Jose must not prescribe
            Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
            other targeted substances, and/or all other Monitored Drugs. Further
            information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
            website at www.cpso.on.ca". The sign shall be translated into any language(s)
            in which Dr. Jose provides services and posted in the waiting rooms of all his
            Office Locations, in a clearly visible location.