Joseph, Geena (CPSO#: 77939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone: 613-432-4851 Ext. 107
Fax: 613-433-5718
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geena Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Joseph ( CPSO# 77939 )

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEENA JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006