Joseph, Llewellyn Winston (CPSO#: 29549)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Llewellyn Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre 596 Davis Drive Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9 Tel: (905) 895-4521
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017