Joseph, Mariamma George (CPSO#: 51429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36379
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.G. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joseph ( CPSO# 51429 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 10 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAMMA GEORGE JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1986