Joseph, Philip George (CPSO#: 81652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C3-110 DBCVSRI
Hamilton General Hospital
232 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40743
Fax: (905) 297-3789
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.G. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Joseph ( CPSO# 81652 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
C3-110 DBCVSRI
232 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP GEORGE JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010