Joseph, Steven Randall (CPSO#: 91324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy Sports Med Clinic
3M Centre
1151 Richmond Street
Western University
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3011
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64944
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN RANDALL JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2015