Josephson, David Alfred Johan (CPSO#: 68750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Josephson ( CPSO# 68750 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone Number: (519) 938-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALFRED JOHAN JOSEPHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPHSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1997