Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Joshi, Arvind Kumar (CPSO#: 27987)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 4605 Miller Avenue, Montreal, QC H3W 2E4
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015