Joshi, Chandrika (CPSO#: 50865)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012