Joshi, Nikhill Pradip (CPSO#: 102881)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 04 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2014 to 29 Jun 2014
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 30 Jun 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2014