Joshi, Pradip Jethalal (CPSO#: 33316)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Manchester, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2017