Joshi, Prashant (CPSO#: 60013)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 8200 Dodge Street, Omaha, NE, USA 68114
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015