Joshi, Preetha Vinay (CPSO#: 82145)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bombay, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 06 Jan 2005 to 22 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007