Joshi, Shelendra (CPSO#: 73429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone: 5198503999
Fax: (519) 601-4997
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

32 CF Health Sciences Centre
701 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 4T7
Canada
Phone: (519) 660-5199
Fax: (519) 660-5357
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shel Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joshi ( CPSO# 73429 )

Business Address:
200 - 240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 850-3999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELENDRA JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2001