Joshi, Suhas Balwant (CPSO#: 51020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Indore University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
Department of Pathology
1200 Fourth Avenue, 3rd Floor
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 46510
Fax: (905) 984-5578
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lifelabs
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Canada
Phone: (905) 688-5481
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suhas and Sangeeta Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joshi ( CPSO# 50866 )
Dr. S. Joshi ( CPSO# 51020 )

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
GNG Site Pathology Department
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Lifelabs
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone Number: (905) 688-5481

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
Department of Patholody
1200 Fourth Avenue
3rd Floor
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUHAS BALWANT JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1984