Joshi, Sushma (CPSO#: 31144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1979

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 673-6211
Fax: (905) 673-9520
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 502
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Canada
Phone: (416) 533-7535
Fax: (416) 533-7535
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joshi ( CPSO# 31144 )

Business Address:
502 - 2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 533-7535

Business Address:
202 - 3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 673-6211

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSHMA JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1979
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 29 Feb 2004

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Jan 2004
Summary:

 On January 29, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Joshi committed an act of professional 
 misconduct that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional in 
 that she paid a patient a sum of money that the patient claimed was owing to her by Dr. Joshi(s 
 husband, who is also a physician, and the patient withdrew the complaint against Dr. Joshi(s 
 husband.

The Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:

1)	that the Registrar suspend 
 Dr. Joshi(s certificate of registration commencing January 30, 	2004, for a period of three 
 months, two months of which will be suspended if, within 	twelve months, Dr. Joshi successfully 
 completes the College ethics course;
2)	that Dr. Joshi attend before the panel to be 
 reprimanded;
3)	that Dr. Joshi pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00; and
4)	that 
 the results of the proceedings to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 29, 2004