Joshi, Vivek Raman (CPSO#: 72474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 453-0766 Ext. 251
Fax: (905) 799-3129
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raman Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Joshi ( CPSO# 72474 )

Business Address:
Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 453-0766

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 12 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVEK RAMAN JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1999