Jothy, Serge Pierre (CPSO#: 45781)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Bordeaux, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Serge Jothy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Apr 2017