Joudi, Fadi Nabih (CPSO#: 74240)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:American University of Beirut, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 16 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001