Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Joughin, Valerie Elaine (CPSO#: 60116)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Aug 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2014