Joyce, David Philip (CPSO#: 71361)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David P. Joyce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 20 2009

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Joyce 59 Pender Street West Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 1R3
Date Received: 28 Jul 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2010