Joyce, Joan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62274)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joyce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 707 Charlotte Street, Peterborough, ON K9J 7B3
Date Received: 05 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015