Joyner, Duncan Campbell (CPSO#: 31413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room E250
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4748
Fax: (416) 480-6856
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3080 Yonge Street
Suite 4076
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Canada
Phone: 647 3476644
Fax: 647 347 6647
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Joyner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Joyner ( CPSO# 31413 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room E250
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4748

Business Address:
Suite 4076
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (647) 347-6644

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUNCAN CAMPBELL JOYNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1980