Joynt, Meileen (CPSO#: 88347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone: (705) 880-2525
Fax: (705) 880-0314
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Joynt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joynt ( CPSO# 88347 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone Number: (705) 880-2525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEILEEN JOYNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYNT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011