Judah, Eli (CPSO#: 58520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 404
Toronto ON  M9C 2Y3
Phone: 416-626-9222
Fax: 416-626-9205
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Apr 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., April 10, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eli
            Judah:

                  a)    Dr. Judah shall be prohibited from administering parenteral
                        sedation; 
                  b)    With the exception of hair transplant procedures, Dr. Judah shall
                        be prohibited from performing cosmetic surgical procedures;
                  c)    Dr. Judah's performance of hair transplant procedures shall be in
                        accordance with any and all conditions and dispositions made by the
                        Premises Inspection Committee of the College; and
                  d)    Dr. Judah shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his
                        practice and such other steps as the College may take for the
                        purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms
                        of the Order at his expense.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Apr 2012
Summary:

On April 10, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eli Judah committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
The Committee also found that Dr. Judah is incompetent. Dr. Judah admitted to the allegations of 
professional misconduct and incompetence. 
 
Dr. Judah is a general practitioner who, at the time of the events at issue, performed cosmetic 
surgery at his clinic. Dr. Judah completed three years of surgical training in a residency program, 
but does not have a Royal College certification in a surgical specialty. Dr. Judah admits to the 
following deficiencies identified in his cosmetic surgery practice:    
 
a)    Dr. Judah failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and 
      treatment of 29 cosmetic surgical patients in the following ways: 
 
      i)    he failed to employ staff with appropriate training; 
      ii)   he failed to administer IV sedation in the presence of a qualified anaesthesiologist; 
      iii)  in respect of some of his patients, he failed to   properly store harvested fat that he 
            later injected; 
      iv)   he excessively sedated patients during surgery; and 
      v)    he performed combined surgery on an unsuitable candidate. 
 
b)    Dr. Judah is incompetent in that his professional care of patients displayed a lack of 
      knowledge, skill and judgment in the following ways: 
 
      i)    he used IV sedation in the absence of a qualified anaesthesiologist; 
      ii)   he directed the use of IV sedation while also being responsible for performing the 
            surgery; 
      iii)  he lacks training in administering IV sedation; and 
      iv)   he lacks knowledge and judgment in IV sedation. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Judah's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      a)    Dr. Judah shall be prohibited from administering parenteral sedation;  
      b)    With the exception of hair transplant procedures, Dr. Judah shall be prohibited 
            from performing cosmetic surgical procedures; 
      c)    Dr. Judah's performance of hair transplant procedures shall be in accordance with 
            any and all conditions and dispositions made by the Premises Inspection 
            Committee of the College; and 
      d)    Dr. Judah shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such 
            other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing 
            his compliance with the terms of the Order at his expense. 
 
2.    Dr. Judah appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
3.    Dr. Judah pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from 
      the date of this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 10, 2012