Judge, Pavan Singh (CPSO#: 108448)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2016 to 03 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2016